House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 615 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 615 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Filed |