E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1704
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2367
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2367
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1552
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3141
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#920
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3015
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/11/15 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 547
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 547
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|