LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1446
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1446
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1446
Compare Versions
HB1446 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1446 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1446 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB1446 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1446 Engrossed May 12, 2015
HB1446 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB1446 Introduced February 16, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1446 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1446 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1446 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB1446 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1446 Engrossed May 12, 2015
HB1446 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB1446 Introduced February 16, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare