E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1461
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2855
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#771
|
Journal Page: 2855
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2855
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2855
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2734
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2734
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2734
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|