Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1455 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Parker, Burrows H.B. No. 1455
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures required before certain condominium
 associations file a suit or initiate an arbitration proceeding for
 a defect or design claim.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 82, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 82.119 and 82.120 to read as follows:
 Sec. 82.119.  PROCEDURES FOR FILING SUIT OR INITIATING
 ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS FOR DEFECT OR DESIGN CLAIMS FOR CERTAIN
 ASSOCIATIONS. (a) This section does not apply to an association
 with less than eight units.
 (b)  In addition to any preconditions to filing suit or
 initiating an arbitration proceeding included in the declaration,
 an association, before filing suit or initiating an arbitration
 proceeding to resolve a claim pertaining to the construction or
 design of a unit or the common elements, must:
 (1)  obtain an inspection and a written independent
 third-party report from a licensed professional engineer that:
 (A)  identifies the specific units or common
 elements subject to the claim;
 (B)  describes the present physical condition of
 the units or common elements subject to the claim; and
 (C)  describes any modifications, maintenance, or
 repairs to the units or common elements performed by the unit owners
 or the association; and
 (2)  obtain approval from unit owners holding more than
 50 percent of the total votes allocated under the declaration,
 voting in person or by proxy as provided by Section 82.110, at a
 regular, annual, or special meeting called in accordance with the
 declaration or bylaws, as applicable.
 (c)  The association must provide written notice of the
 inspection to be conducted by the engineer to each party subject to
 a claim not later than the 10th day before the date the inspection
 occurs. The notice must:
 (1)  identify the party engaged to prepare the report
 required by Subsection (b)(1);
 (2)  identify the specific units or common elements to
 be inspected; and
 (3)  include the date and time the inspection will
 occur.
 (d)  Each party subject to a claim may attend the inspection
 conducted by the engineer, either personally or through an agent.
 (e)  Before providing the notice of the meeting under
 Subsection (f), an association must:
 (1)  on completion of the independent third-party
 report, provide the report to each unit owner and each party subject
 to a claim; and
 (2)  allow each party subject to a claim at least 90
 days after the date of completion of the report to inspect and
 correct any condition identified in the report.
 (f)  Not later than the 30th day before the date the meeting
 described by Subsection (b)(2) is held, the association must
 provide each unit owner with written notice of the date, time, and
 location of the meeting. The notice must also include:
 (1)  a description of the nature of the claim, the
 relief sought, the anticipated duration of prosecuting the claim,
 and the likelihood of success;
 (2)  a copy of the report required by Subsection
 (b)(1);
 (3)  a copy of the contract or proposed contract
 between the association and the attorney selected by the board to
 assert or provide assistance with the claim;
 (4)  a description of the attorney's fees, consultant
 fees, expert witness fees, and court costs, whether incurred by the
 association directly or for which the association may be liable as a
 result of prosecuting the claim;
 (5)  a summary of the steps previously taken by the
 association to resolve the claim;
 (6)  a statement that initiating a lawsuit or
 arbitration proceeding to resolve a claim may affect the market
 value, marketability, or refinancing of a unit while the claim is
 prosecuted; and
 (7)  a description of the manner in which the
 association proposes to fund the cost of prosecuting the claim.
 (g)  The notice required by Subsection (f) must be prepared
 and signed by a person who is not:
 (1)  the attorney who represents or will represent the
 association in the claim;
 (2)  a member of the law firm of the attorney who
 represents or will represent the association in the claim; or
 (3)  employed by or otherwise affiliated with the law
 firm of the attorney who represents or will represent the
 association in the claim.
 (h)  The period of limitations for filing a suit or
 initiating an arbitration proceeding for a claim described by
 Subsection (b) is tolled until the first anniversary of the date the
 procedures are initiated by the association under that subsection
 if the procedures are initiated during the final year of the
 applicable period of limitation.
 Sec. 82.120.  BINDING ARBITRATION FOR CERTAIN CLAIMS.  (a)  A
 declaration may provide that a claim pertaining to the construction
 or design of a unit or the common elements must be resolved by
 binding arbitration and may provide for a process by which the claim
 is resolved.
 (b)  An amendment to the declaration that modifies or removes
 the arbitration requirement or the process associated with
 resolution of a claim may not apply retroactively to a claim
 regarding the construction or design of units or common elements
 based on an alleged act or omission that occurred before the date of
 the amendment.
 SECTION 2.  Section 82.119, Property Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a suit filed or arbitration proceeding
 initiated on or after the effective date of this Act. A suit filed
 or arbitration proceeding initiated before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law applicable to the claim immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *