Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1552 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#925 | Journal Page: 3146 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3146 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3146 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3033 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3033 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 548 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 548 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Filed |