Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1826
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5971
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3399
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5514
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5514
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5514
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2439
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2438
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1342
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2488
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#595
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2409
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Otto
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/4/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
|
|
Journal Page: 879
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 879
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|