LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB15
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB15
Compare Versions
HB15 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB15 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB15 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB15 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB15 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
HB15 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB15 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB15 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB15 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
HB15 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB15 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
HB15 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare