E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4597
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1463
|
Journal Page: 4597
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4597
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
House
|
02/17/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|