LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1510
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1510
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1510
Compare Versions
HB1510 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1510 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1510 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB1510 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
HB1510 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB1510 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
HB1510 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1510 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1510 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1510 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB1510 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
HB1510 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB1510 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
HB1510 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare