E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1509
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#896
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3067
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/11/15 4:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#832
|
Journal Page: 2944
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2944
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/8/15 3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 2919
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 2919
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2919
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
House
|
02/17/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|