Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1514 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1514
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 3; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to health insurance identification cards issued by
 qualified health plan issuers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended by adding
 Subtitle L to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE L. QUALIFIED HEALTH PLAN MANDATORY DISCLOSURES
 CHAPTER 1693. QUALIFIED HEALTH PLAN IDENTIFICATION CARDS
 Sec. 1693.001.  DEFINITIONS. Except as provided by Section
 1693.003, in this chapter, "enrollee," "exchange," "qualified
 health plan," and "qualified health plan issuer" have the meanings
 assigned by 45 C.F.R. Section 155.20 as that section existed on
 January 1, 2015.
 Sec. 1693.002.  REQUIRED INFORMATION. An identification
 card or other similar document issued by a qualified health plan
 issuer to an enrollee of a qualified health plan purchased through
 an exchange must, in addition to any requirement under other law,
 including Sections 843.209, 1301.162, and 1369.153, display on the
 card or document in a location of the issuer's choice the acronym
 "QHP."
 Sec. 1693.003.  COMMISSIONER DETERMINATIONS REGARDING
 FEDERAL REGULATIONS. (a) The commissioner shall monitor 45 C.F.R.
 Section 155.20 for amendments to the definitions listed in Section
 1693.001 and determine if it is in the best interest of the state to
 adopt an amended definition for purposes of this chapter. If the
 commissioner determines that it is in the best interest of the state
 to adopt the amended definition, the commissioner by rule shall
 adopt the amended definition.
 (b)  In making the determination about an amendment, the
 commissioner shall consider, in addition to other factors
 affecting the public interest, the beneficial and adverse effects
 the amendment may have on:
 (1)  individuals who are receiving medical care and
 health care services in this state; and
 (2)  health care providers and physicians.
 Sec. 1693.004.  REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. The commissioner
 shall prepare a report of a determination made under Section
 1693.003, including an explanation of the reasons for the
 determination, and file the report with the presiding officer of
 each house of the legislature not later than the 30th day after the
 date the determination is made.
 Sec. 1693.005.  RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules as
 necessary to administer and enforce this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *