Senate | 05/21/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1846 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2705 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#709 | Journal Page: 2704 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2704 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2704 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2635 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2635 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Postponed | 5/6/15 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 2627 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2627 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 1-Burkett | Journal Page: 2627 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2626 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1446 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 590 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 590 | |
House | 02/17/2015 | Filed |