Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1542 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1542
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of digital message display systems in certain
 public facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.0061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.0061.  ADVERTISING INSIDE DRIVER'S LICENSE
 OFFICES. The department may enter into an agreement with a public
 or private entity for a digital message display system to promote
 department information or news items of general interest in a
 publicly accessible area of a driver's license office. For the
 purpose of funding the system, a portion of the information
 displayed on the system may consist of digital advertisements. The
 department may review and has the right to reject any proposed
 advertising to be displayed on a system.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 1001, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 1001.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.014.  ADVERTISING INSIDE CERTAIN DEPARTMENT
 FACILITIES. The department may enter into an agreement with a
 public or private entity for a digital message display system to
 promote department information or news items of general interest in
 a publicly accessible area of a facility operated by the
 department. For the purpose of funding the system, a portion of the
 information displayed on the system may consist of digital
 advertisements. The department may review and has the right to
 reject any proposed advertising to be displayed on a system.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 291, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 291.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 291.011.  ADVERTISING INSIDE CERTAIN COUNTY
 FACILITIES. (a)  The commissioners court of a county may enter into
 an agreement with a public or private entity for a digital message
 display system to promote county information or news items of
 general interest in:
 (1)  a publicly accessible area of the office of the tax
 assessor-collector or a branch office established under Section
 292.025, 292.026, or 292.027 for which a deputy assessor-collector
 has been appointed; or
 (2)  a jury assembly room.
 (b)  For the purpose of funding a digital message display
 system, a portion of the information displayed on the system may
 consist of digital advertisements. The commissioners court may
 review and has the right to reject any proposed advertising to be
 displayed on a system.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *