House | 05/14/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3421 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 459 | Journal Page: 3420 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3348 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3348 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3255 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3255 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 02/17/2015 | Filed |