E | 05/28/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5571 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4088 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3798 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3786 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1643 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1252 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2286 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Record vote | RV#503 | Journal Page: 2286 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2286 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2286 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 396 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 396 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |