Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1595 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Murr, Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 1595
 (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to testing certain defendants or confined persons for
 communicable diseases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Article 18.22, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Art. 18.22. TESTING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS OR CONFINED PERSONS
 FOR COMMUNICABLE DISEASES [FOLLOWING CERTAIN ARRESTS].
 SECTION 2.  Article 18.22, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection
 (d) to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who is arrested for a misdemeanor or felony and
 who during the commission of that offense or the [an] arrest, during
 a judicial proceeding or initial period of confinement following
 the arrest, or during the person's confinement after a conviction
 or adjudication resulting from the arrest [commission of that
 offense] causes the person's bodily fluids to come into contact
 with a peace officer, a magistrate, or an employee of a correctional
 facility where the person is confined [to come into contact with the
 person's bodily fluids] shall, at the direction of the court having
 jurisdiction over the arrested person, undergo a medical procedure
 or test designed to show or help show whether the person has a
 communicable disease. The court may direct the person to undergo
 the procedure or test on its own motion or on the request of the
 peace officer, magistrate, or correctional facility employee. If
 the person refuses to submit voluntarily to the procedure or test,
 the court shall require the person to submit to the procedure or
 test. Notwithstanding any other law, the person performing the
 procedure or test shall make the test results available to the local
 health authority, and the local health authority shall notify the
 peace officer, magistrate, or correctional facility employee, as
 appropriate, of the test result. The state may not use the fact
 that a medical procedure or test was performed on a person under
 this article, or use the results of the procedure or test, in any
 criminal proceeding arising out of the alleged offense.
 (b)  Testing under this article shall be conducted in
 accordance with written infectious disease control protocols
 adopted by the Department [Texas Board] of State Health Services
 that clearly establish procedural guidelines that provide criteria
 for testing and that respect the rights of the arrested person and
 the peace officer, magistrate, or correctional facility employee.
 (d)  In this article, "correctional facility" means:
 (1)  any place described by Section 1.07(a)(14), Penal
 Code; or
 (2)  a "secure correctional facility" or "secure
 detention facility" as those terms are defined by Section 51.02,
 Family Code.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 motion by the court or request of a magistrate or correctional
 facility employee made on or after the effective date of this Act,
 regardless of whether the offense for which the person was arrested
 or the applicable contact with bodily fluids occurred before, on,
 or after that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *