Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#776 | Journal Page: 2860 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2860 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2860 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |