Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1397 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#661 | Journal Page: 2593 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2593 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |