E
|
06/15/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4466
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4109
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1583
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#529
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Riddle
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|