House | 04/30/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2120 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 534 | Journal Page: 2120 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |