Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1657 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Vo (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1657
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 15, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of an experience-rated employer's
 eligibility for a surplus credit rate under the Texas Unemployment
 Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 204.0652(d), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  An employer may not receive a surplus credit rate if any
 delinquent contributions are due on the computation [contribution]
 date, but is eligible for a surplus credit rate beginning on the
 calendar quarter following the quarter in which the delinquent
 contributions are paid.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *