Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1662 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheets (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1662
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain property from municipal
 drainage service charges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.053, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (d)  A municipality may exempt property owned by a religious
 organization that is exempt from taxation pursuant to Section
 11.20, Tax Code, from all or a portion of drainage charges under
 this subchapter, as the governing body of the municipality
 considers appropriate.
 (d-1)  A municipality may exempt property used for cemetery
 purposes from drainage charges under Section 552.047 if the
 cemetery is closed to new interments and does not accept new
 burials.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *