Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1678 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Raymond, Price, Naishtat H.B. No. 1678
2- (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner)
3- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
4- April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
5- and Human Services; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the
6- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1678
82
93
10- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
114 AN ACT
125 relating to the continuation and functions of the Governor's
136 Committee on People with Disabilities.
147 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
158 SECTION 1. Section 115.005, Human Resources Code, is
169 amended to read as follows:
1710 Sec. 115.005. SUNSET PROVISION. The Governor's Committee
1811 on People with Disabilities is subject to Chapter 325, Government
1912 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
2013 by that chapter, the committee is abolished and this chapter
2114 expires September 1, 2027 [2015].
2215 SECTION 2. Section 115.009, Human Resources Code, as
2316 amended by S.B. No. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
2417 Session, 2015, is amended to read as follows:
2518 Sec. 115.009. FUNCTIONS. The committee shall:
2619 (1) serve as a central source of information and
2720 education on the abilities, rights, problems, and needs of persons
2821 with disabilities and, as necessary, issue reports;
2922 (2) provide information to and advise the governor and
3023 the governor's staff on matters relating to the full participation
3124 of persons with disabilities in all aspects of life;
3225 (3) before the end of each even-numbered year, submit
3326 to the governor and to the legislature a report that includes[:
3427 [(A) the status of the state's compliance with
3528 federal and state laws pertaining to rights and opportunities for
3629 persons with disabilities and recommendations to achieve further
3730 compliance, if necessary;
3831 [(B) a long-range state plan for persons with
3932 disabilities and recommendations to implement that plan; and
4033 [(C)] any recommended changes in state laws
4134 relating to persons with disabilities;
4235 (4) serve as the state's liaison agency in working with
4336 the Office of Disability [President's Committee on] Employment
4437 Policy [of Persons with Disabilities] and other entities involved
4538 in activities or concerns affecting persons with disabilities;
4639 (5) develop and work with a statewide network of
4740 volunteer community-level committees to promote dissemination of
4841 information about and implementation of federal and state laws
4942 addressing rights and opportunities for persons with disabilities;
5043 (6) [evaluate the state's compliance with the
5144 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 (42 U.S.C. Section 12101 et
5245 seq.) and other federal and state statutes relating to rights and
5346 opportunities for persons with disabilities;
5447 [(7)] provide information and technical assistance to
5548 public and private agencies and businesses to promote and
5649 facilitate implementation of the Americans with Disabilities Act of
5750 1990 (42 U.S.C. Section 12101 et seq.) and other federal and state
5851 statutes relating to rights and opportunities of persons with
5952 disabilities;
6053 (7) [ (8) collect and evaluate data on employment of
6154 persons with disabilities by state agencies;
6255 [(9)] work with legislative committees and with state
6356 agencies on the development of laws and policies that affect
6457 persons with disabilities;
6558 (8) [(10)] promote the compilation and publication of
6659 state laws relating to persons with disabilities; [and]
6760 (9) [(11)] issue awards and other forms of recognition
6861 to persons and organizations making outstanding contributions to
6962 the employment of persons with disabilities and to public awareness
7063 of issues impacting persons with disabilities;
7164 (10) identify each current long-range plan relating to
7265 persons with disabilities in this state created by a state agency, a
7366 committee of a state agency, or a nonprofit organization required
7467 by federal law to produce such a plan, and publish the link to the
7568 Internet website address for each long-range plan, if available, on
7669 the Internet website of the Governor's Committee on People with
7770 Disabilities; and
7871 (11) review and analyze the long-range plans described
7972 by Subdivision (10) to identify gaps in state laws and services for
8073 persons with disabilities and make biennial recommendations in the
8174 committee's report required under Subdivision (3) to address
8275 identified gaps.
8376 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
84- * * * * *
77+ ______________________________ ______________________________
78+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
79+ I certify that H.B. No. 1678 was passed by the House on April
80+ 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 2 present, not
81+ voting.
82+ ______________________________
83+ Chief Clerk of the House
84+ I certify that H.B. No. 1678 was passed by the Senate on May
85+ 12, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1.
86+ ______________________________
87+ Secretary of the Senate
88+ APPROVED: _____________________
89+ Date
90+ _____________________
91+ Governor