Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1678 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond, Price, Naishtat H.B. No. 1678
 (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the Governor's
 Committee on People with Disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 115.005, Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 115.005.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Governor's Committee
 on People with Disabilities is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the committee is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2027 [2015].
 SECTION 2.  Section 115.009, Human Resources Code, as
 amended by S.B. No. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 115.009.  FUNCTIONS. The committee shall:
 (1)  serve as a central source of information and
 education on the abilities, rights, problems, and needs of persons
 with disabilities and, as necessary, issue reports;
 (2)  provide information to and advise the governor and
 the governor's staff on matters relating to the full participation
 of persons with disabilities in all aspects of life;
 (3)  before the end of each even-numbered year, submit
 to the governor and to the legislature a report that includes[:
 [(A)     the status of the state's compliance with
 federal and state laws pertaining to rights and opportunities for
 persons with disabilities and recommendations to achieve further
 compliance, if necessary;
 [(B)     a long-range state plan for persons with
 disabilities and recommendations to implement that plan; and
 [(C)]  any recommended changes in state laws
 relating to persons with disabilities;
 (4)  serve as the state's liaison agency in working with
 the Office of Disability [President's Committee on] Employment
 Policy [of Persons with Disabilities] and other entities involved
 in activities or concerns affecting persons with disabilities;
 (5)  develop and work with a statewide network of
 volunteer community-level committees to promote dissemination of
 information about and implementation of federal and state laws
 addressing rights and opportunities for persons with disabilities;
 (6)  [evaluate the state's compliance with the
 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 (42 U.S.C. Section 12101 et
 seq.) and other federal and state statutes relating to rights and
 opportunities for persons with disabilities;
 [(7)]  provide information and technical assistance to
 public and private agencies and businesses to promote and
 facilitate implementation of the Americans with Disabilities Act of
 1990 (42 U.S.C. Section 12101 et seq.) and other federal and state
 statutes relating to rights and opportunities of persons with
 disabilities;
 (7) [ (8)     collect and evaluate data on employment of
 persons with disabilities by state agencies;
 [(9)]  work with legislative committees and with state
 agencies on the development of laws and policies that affect
 persons with disabilities;
 (8) [(10)]  promote the compilation and publication of
 state laws relating to persons with disabilities; [and]
 (9) [(11)]  issue awards and other forms of recognition
 to persons and organizations making outstanding contributions to
 the employment of persons with disabilities and to public awareness
 of issues impacting persons with disabilities;
 (10)  identify each current long-range plan relating to
 persons with disabilities in this state created by a state agency, a
 committee of a state agency, or a nonprofit organization required
 by federal law to produce such a plan, and publish the link to the
 Internet website address for each long-range plan, if available, on
 the Internet website of the Governor's Committee on People with
 Disabilities; and
 (11)  review and analyze the long-range plans described
 by Subdivision (10) to identify gaps in state laws and services for
 persons with disabilities and make biennial recommendations in the
 committee's report required under Subdivision (3) to address
 identified gaps.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *