Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1683 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1683
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an identifying number assigned to a notary public by the
 secretary of state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 406.001, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 406.001.  APPOINTMENTS. (a) The secretary of state may
 appoint a notary public at any time.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall assign each notary public
 an identifying number and keep a record of the number assigned to
 each notary public.
 SECTION 2.  Section 406.008(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  When the commission is issued, the secretary of state
 shall supply the notary public with:
 (1)  materials outlining the powers and duties of the
 office;
 (2)  a list of prohibited acts; [and]
 (3)  sample forms for an acknowledgment, jurat, and
 verification and for the administering of an oath, protest, and
 deposition; and
 (4)  the identifying number assigned to the notary
 public.
 SECTION 3.  Section 406.013(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A notary public shall provide a seal of office that
 clearly shows, when embossed, stamped, or printed on a document,
 the words "Notary Public, State of Texas" around a star of five
 points, the notary public's name, the notary public's identifying
 number, and the date the notary public's commission expires. The
 notary public shall authenticate all official acts with the seal of
 office.
 SECTION 4.  Notwithstanding the requirements of this Act
 that the secretary of state issue an identifying number to each
 notary public, the secretary of state is required to issue an
 identifying number only to a notary public who applies for a
 commission or a reappointment on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *