House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 600 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 600 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Filed |