E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1748
|
Journal Page: 5633
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5623
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5694
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3443
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3443
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4889
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4889
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4889
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2131
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1895
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#309
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1737
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#292
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
24-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amended
|
23-Moody
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
20-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-P. King
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
17-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
2-P. King
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
15-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
3-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 1614
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Amended
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
House
|
02/20/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|