Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1197 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2085 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | RV#441 | Journal Page: 2084 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2084 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2084 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2059 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 650 | |
House | 02/20/2015 | Filed |