Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1725 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Stephenson (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1725
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of local boards of the Texas Emergency
 Services Retirement System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 865.012, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  A local board is composed of:
 (1)  one trustee selected by the governing body of the
 political subdivision of which a participating department is a
 part;
 (2)  except as provided by Subsection (a-1), three
 trustees who are active members representing a participating
 department chosen by a majority of the emergency services personnel
 in the department who are eligible to participate in the pension
 system; and
 (3)  two trustees who are representatives of the
 political subdivision who are chosen by the other members of the
 local board.
 (a-1)  If a participating department does not have a
 sufficient number of active members to serve on a local board under
 Subsection (a)(2), the other members of the local board, or if there
 are no other members of the local board, the governing body of the
 political subdivision of which the department is a part shall
 select one or more trustees to serve under that subdivision. A
 person selected under this subsection to serve as a trustee must be:
 (1)  a retiree of the pension system; or
 (2)  a beneficiary of the pension system who is the
 surviving spouse of a former member or retiree.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *