Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1462 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2854 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#769 | Journal Page: 2853 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2853 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2853 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2733 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amended | 1-Galindo | Journal Page: 2732 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2732 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 692 | |
House | 02/20/2015 | Filed |