House
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 671
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 653
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|