Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1762 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Otto, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1762
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
3- May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
4- Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
5- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
6- to printer.)
1+H.B. No. 1762
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the creation of a health care advocacy program for
126 veterans.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
159 amended by adding Section 434.023 to read as follows:
1610 Sec. 434.023. HEALTH CARE ADVOCACY PROGRAM FOR VETERANS.
1711 (a) In this section, "veteran" means a person who has served in:
1812 (1) the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or marine
1913 corps of the United States; or
2014 (2) the Texas National Guard as defined by Section
2115 431.001.
2216 (b) The commission by rule shall establish and implement a
2317 health care advocacy program to assist veterans in gaining access
2418 to health care facilities of the United States Department of
2519 Veterans Affairs.
2620 (c) The program shall provide assistance to veterans by:
2721 (1) resolving any access issues raised by veterans in
2822 this state or referred to the commission by the veterans toll-free
2923 hotline operated under Section 161.077, Natural Resources Code;
3024 (2) coordinating with the Veterans Health
3125 Administration of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
3226 to support the health care advocacy program established under this
3327 section;
3428 (3) coordinating with health care providers in this
3529 state to expand providers' opportunities to treat veterans through
3630 the United States Department of Veterans Affairs;
3731 (4) reviewing and researching programs, projects, and
3832 initiatives designed to address the health care needs of veterans;
3933 (5) evaluating the effectiveness of the efforts of the
4034 commission to improve access to health care services for veterans;
4135 (6) making recommendations to the executive director
4236 of the commission to improve health care services and assistance
4337 for veterans;
4438 (7) incorporating veterans' health care issues into
4539 the commission's strategic plan required under Section 2056.002;
4640 (8) assisting veterans in securing benefits and
4741 services; and
4842 (9) recommending legislative initiatives and policies
4943 at the local, state, and national levels to address issues
5044 affecting health care for veterans.
5145 (d) The executive director of the commission shall appoint a
5246 program coordinator to administer the health care advocacy program.
5347 (e) The commission shall provide facilities as appropriate
5448 to support the program to the extent funding is available for that
5549 purpose.
5650 SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date
5751 of this Act but not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas Veterans
5852 Commission shall establish the health care advocacy program for
5953 veterans as required under Section 434.023, Government Code, as
6054 added by this Act, and the Texas Veterans Commission shall adopt any
6155 rules necessary to implement the program.
6256 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6357 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6458 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6559 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6660 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
67- * * * * *
61+ ______________________________ ______________________________
62+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
63+ I certify that H.B. No. 1762 was passed by the House on May 4,
64+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not
65+ voting.
66+ ______________________________
67+ Chief Clerk of the House
68+ I certify that H.B. No. 1762 was passed by the Senate on May
69+ 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
70+ ______________________________
71+ Secretary of the Senate
72+ APPROVED: _____________________
73+ Date
74+ _____________________
75+ Governor