Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1762 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Otto, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1762
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a health care advocacy program for
 veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.023.  HEALTH CARE ADVOCACY PROGRAM FOR VETERANS.
 (a)  In this section, "veteran" means a person who has served in:
 (1)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or marine
 corps of the United States; or
 (2)  the Texas National Guard as defined by Section
 431.001.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall establish and implement a
 health care advocacy program to assist veterans in gaining access
 to health care facilities of the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs.
 (c)  The program shall provide assistance to veterans by:
 (1)  resolving any access issues raised by veterans in
 this state or referred to the commission by the veterans toll-free
 hotline operated under Section 161.077, Natural Resources Code;
 (2)  coordinating with the Veterans Health
 Administration of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
 to support the health care advocacy program established under this
 section;
 (3)  coordinating with health care providers in this
 state to expand providers' opportunities to treat veterans through
 the United States Department of Veterans Affairs;
 (4)  reviewing and researching programs, projects, and
 initiatives designed to address the health care needs of veterans;
 (5)  evaluating the effectiveness of the efforts of the
 commission to improve access to health care services for veterans;
 (6)  making recommendations to the executive director
 of the commission to improve health care services and assistance
 for veterans;
 (7)  incorporating veterans' health care issues into
 the commission's strategic plan required under Section 2056.002;
 (8)  assisting veterans in securing benefits and
 services; and
 (9)  recommending legislative initiatives and policies
 at the local, state, and national levels to address issues
 affecting health care for veterans.
 (d)  The executive director of the commission shall appoint a
 program coordinator to administer the health care advocacy program.
 (e)  The commission shall provide facilities as appropriate
 to support the program to the extent funding is available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act but not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas Veterans
 Commission shall establish the health care advocacy program for
 veterans as required under Section 434.023, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, and the Texas Veterans Commission shall adopt any
 rules necessary to implement the program.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *