E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4466
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1331
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4190
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#415
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#396
|
Journal Page: 1996
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1996
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/27/15 2:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1499
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|