LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1794
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1794
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1794
Compare Versions
HB1794 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1794 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1794 Enrolled May 23, 2015
HB1794 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
HB1794 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB1794 Comm Sub April 10, 2015
HB1794 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1794 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1794 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1794 Enrolled May 23, 2015
HB1794 Comm Sub May 13, 2015
HB1794 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB1794 Comm Sub April 10, 2015
HB1794 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare