House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3370 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1052 | Journal Page: 3369 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3369 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 3369 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | 7-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3369 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment amended | 14-Rinaldi | Journal Page: 3368 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Vote reconsidered | 7-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3368 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment tabled | 13-Gonzlez | Journal Page: 3366 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amended | 12-C. Anderson | Journal Page: 3366 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 9-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3363 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Motion to table fails | 6-Howard, et al. | Journal Page: 3358 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 6-Howard, Ashby, Allen, and VanDeaver | Journal Page: 3357 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3352 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 655 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 655 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Filed |