Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1807 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1807
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 to maintain an inventory of postsecondary educational programs and
 services for persons with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0663 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0663.  INVENTORY OF POSTSECONDARY EDUCATIONAL
 PROGRAMS AND SERVICES FOR PERSONS WITH INTELLECTUAL AND
 DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES. (a) The board shall maintain an
 inventory of all postsecondary educational programs and services
 provided for persons with intellectual and developmental
 disabilities by institutions of higher education.
 (b)  The board shall:
 (1)  post the inventory on the board's Internet website
 in an easily identifiable and accessible location;
 (2)  submit the inventory to the Texas Education Agency
 for inclusion in the transition and employment guide under Section
 29.0112; and
 (3)  update the inventory at least once every two
 years.
 (c)  At times prescribed by the board, each institution of
 higher education shall report to the board all programs and
 services described by Subsection (a) provided by that institution.
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.0112(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The transition and employment guide must contain
 information specific to this state regarding:
 (1)  transition services;
 (2)  employment and supported employment services;
 (3)  social security programs;
 (4)  community and long-term services and support;
 (5)  postsecondary educational programs and services,
 including the inventory maintained by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board under Section 61.0663;
 (6)  information sharing with health and human services
 agencies and providers;
 (7)  guardianship and alternatives to guardianship;
 (8)  self-advocacy, person-directed planning, and
 self-determination; and
 (9)  contact information for all relevant state
 agencies.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall compile the inventory required by Section 61.0663, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2016. The
 Texas Education Agency shall comply with Section 29.0112(b)(5),
 Education Code, as amended by this Act, as soon as practicable after
 the inventory is available.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *