House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1390 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 656 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Filed |