Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2703
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#707
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|