Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1830 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1830
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of amusement redemption machine game
 rooms.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 234, Local Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 1284 (H.B. 2123), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 234.132, Local Government Code, as added
 by Chapter 1377 (H.B. 1127), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *