E | 06/20/2015 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6050 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4084 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1308 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#559 | Journal Page: 2384 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Amended | 1-Dale | Journal Page: 2324 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1062 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 292 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |