Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB184 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Dale, Gonzales, Farney H.B. No. 184
 (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of costs and attorney's fees incurred by
 a Court of Inquiry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 52.04, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), the [The] county
 in which the affidavit under Article 52.01 was filed shall be
 responsible for any attorney's fees awarded under Subsection (b).
 (d)  If the subject of the Court of Inquiry was an officer or
 employee of the state at the time of the alleged offense, the state
 shall be responsible for any attorney's fees awarded under
 Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  Article 52.09, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection
 (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), all [All] costs
 incurred in conducting a Court of Inquiry, including compensation
 of an attorney pro tem, shall be borne by:
 (1)  the county in which the [said] Court of Inquiry is
 conducted, if the subject of the inquiry was not an officer or
 employee of the state at the time of the alleged offense; or
 (2)  the state, if the subject of the inquiry was an
 officer or employee of the state at the time of the alleged offense.
 (a-1)  If[; provided, however, that where] the Attorney
 General of Texas [has] submitted a request in writing to the judge
 for the holding of the [such] Court of Inquiry, [then and in that
 event] the costs described by Subsection (a) shall be borne by the
 state [State of Texas] and shall be taxed to the attorney general
 and paid in the same manner and from the same funds as other court
 costs.
 (b)  Assistance by a county or district attorney to a Court
 of Inquiry is a duty of the attorney's office, and the attorney may
 not receive a fee for the service. The state or the [A] county
 responsible for costs incurred under Subsection (a), as applicable,
 is not liable for attorney's fees claimed for assistance in a Court
 of Inquiry by any attorney other than an attorney pro tem appointed
 under Article 52.01(d) [of this code].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a Court of Inquiry commenced on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A Court of Inquiry commenced before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the Court of
 Inquiry was commenced, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *