House | 04/29/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2088 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 125 | Journal Page: 2088 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Postponed | 4/29/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2027 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2027 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Postponed | 4/28/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1721 |
House | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1720 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 626 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 626 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Filed |