Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1336 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1310 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#550 | Journal Page: 2376 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2321 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2321 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2321 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 626 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 626 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Filed |