Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB188 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 188
 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition, duties, and continuation of the human
 trafficking prevention task force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 402.035(c), (d), and (h), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The task force is composed of the following:
 (1)  the governor or the governor's designee;
 (2)  the attorney general or the attorney general's
 designee;
 (3)  the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission or the executive commissioner's designee;
 (4)  the commissioner of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services or the commissioner's designee;
 (5)  the commissioner of the Department of State Health
 Services or the commissioner's designee;
 (6)  the public safety director of the Department of
 Public Safety or the director's designee;
 (7)  one representative from each of the following
 state agencies, appointed by the chief administrative officer of
 the respective agency:
 (A)  the Texas Workforce Commission;
 (B)  the Texas Department of Criminal Justice;
 (C)  the Texas Juvenile Justice Department [Youth
 Commission;
 [(D)  the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission];
 and
 (D) [(E)]  the Texas Alcoholic Beverage
 Commission; and
 (8)  as appointed by the attorney general:
 (A)  a chief public defender employed by a public
 defender's office, as defined by Article 26.044(a), Code of
 Criminal Procedure, or an attorney designated by the chief public
 defender;
 (B)  an attorney representing the state;
 (C)  a representative of:
 (i)  a hotel and motel association;
 (ii)  a district and county attorneys
 association; [and]
 (iii)  a state police association; and
 (iv)  a statewide medical association;
 (D)  representatives of sheriff's departments;
 (E)  representatives of local law enforcement
 agencies affected by human trafficking; and
 (F)  representatives of nongovernmental entities
 making comprehensive efforts to combat human trafficking by:
 (i)  identifying human trafficking victims;
 (ii)  providing legal or other services to
 human trafficking victims;
 (iii)  participating in community outreach
 or public awareness efforts regarding human trafficking;
 (iv)  providing or developing training
 regarding the prevention of human trafficking; or
 (v)  engaging in other activities designed
 to prevent human trafficking.
 (d)  The task force shall:
 (1)  collaborate, as needed to fulfill the duties of
 the task force, with:
 (A)  United States attorneys for the districts of
 Texas; and
 (B)  special agents or customs and border
 protection officers and border patrol agents of:
 (i)  the Federal Bureau of Investigation;
 (ii)  the United States Drug Enforcement
 Administration;
 (iii)  the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco,
 Firearms and Explosives;
 (iv)  United States Immigration and Customs
 Enforcement; or
 (v)  the United States Department of
 Homeland Security;
 (2)  collect, organize, and periodically publish
 statistical data on the nature and extent of human trafficking in
 this state, including data described by Subdivisions (4)(A), (B),
 (C), (D), and (E);
 (3)  solicit cooperation and assistance from state and
 local governmental agencies, political subdivisions of the state,
 nongovernmental organizations, and other persons, as appropriate,
 for the purpose of collecting and organizing statistical data under
 Subdivision (2);
 (4)  ensure that each state or local governmental
 agency and political subdivision of the state and each state or
 local law enforcement agency, district attorney, or county attorney
 that assists in the prevention of human trafficking collects
 statistical data related to human trafficking, including, as
 appropriate:
 (A)  the number of investigations concerning,
 arrests and prosecutions for, and convictions of:
 (i)  the offense of trafficking of persons;
 [and]
 (ii)  the offense of forgery or an offense
 under Chapter 43, Penal Code, if the offense was committed as part
 of a criminal episode involving the trafficking of persons; and
 (iii)  an offense punishable under Section
 43.02(c)(3), Penal Code, regardless of whether the offense was
 committed as part of a criminal episode involving the trafficking
 of persons;
 (B)  demographic information on persons who are
 convicted of offenses described by Paragraph (A) and persons who
 are the victims of those offenses;
 (C)  geographic routes by which human trafficking
 victims are trafficked, including routes by which victims are
 trafficked across this state's international border, and
 geographic patterns in human trafficking, including the country or
 state of origin and the country or state of destination;
 (D)  means of transportation and methods used by
 persons who engage in trafficking to transport their victims; and
 (E)  social and economic factors that create a
 demand for the labor or services that victims of human trafficking
 are forced to provide;
 (5)  work with the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement
 [Officer Standards and Education] to develop and conduct training
 for law enforcement personnel, victim service providers, and
 medical service providers to identify victims of human trafficking;
 (6)  work with the Texas Education Agency, the
 Department of Family and Protective Services, and the Health and
 Human Services Commission to:
 (A)  develop a list of key indicators that a
 person is a victim of human trafficking;
 (B)  develop a standardized curriculum for
 training doctors, nurses, emergency medical services personnel,
 teachers, school counselors, school administrators, and personnel
 from the Department of Family and Protective Services and the
 Health and Human Services Commission to identify and assist victims
 of human trafficking;
 (C)  train doctors, nurses, emergency medical
 services personnel, teachers, school counselors, school
 administrators, and personnel from the Department of Family and
 Protective Services and the Health and Human Services Commission to
 identify and assist victims of human trafficking;
 (D)  develop and conduct training for personnel
 from the Department of Family and Protective Services and the
 Health and Human Services Commission on methods for identifying
 children in foster care who may be at risk of becoming victims of
 human trafficking; and
 (E)  develop a process for referring identified
 human trafficking victims and individuals at risk of becoming
 victims to appropriate entities for services;
 (7)  on the request of a judge of a county court, county
 court at law, or district court or a county attorney, district
 attorney, or criminal district attorney, assist and train the judge
 or the judge's staff or the attorney or the attorney's staff in the
 recognition and prevention of human trafficking;
 (8)  examine training protocols related to human
 trafficking issues, as developed and implemented by federal, state,
 and local law enforcement agencies;
 (9)  collaborate with state and local governmental
 agencies, political subdivisions of the state, and nongovernmental
 organizations to implement a media awareness campaign in
 communities affected by human trafficking;
 (10)  develop recommendations on how to strengthen
 state and local efforts to prevent human trafficking, protect and
 assist human trafficking victims, and prosecute human trafficking
 offenders; [and]
 (11)  examine the extent to which human trafficking is
 associated with the operation of sexually oriented businesses, as
 defined by Section 243.002, Local Government Code, and the
 workplace or public health concerns that are created by the
 association of human trafficking and the operation of sexually
 oriented businesses; and
 (12)  develop recommendations for addressing the
 demand for forced labor or services or sexual conduct involving
 victims of human trafficking, including recommendations for
 increased penalties for individuals who engage or attempt to engage
 in prostitution with victims younger than 18 years of age.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2017 [2015].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *