E | 06/04/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/04/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/27/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5213 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4807 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4984 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4570 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1983 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2024 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2979 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#847 | Journal Page: 2978 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2978 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2978 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2947 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amended | 1-S. King | Journal Page: 2947 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2947 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 714 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 714 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |