House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2781 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#744 | Journal Page: 2780 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2780 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Amended | 1-Raney | Journal Page: 2780 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 10(b); Article III, Section 56(b); Article III, Section 56(a)(2); Article III, More | Journal Page: 2779 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/7/15 3:25 PM | Journal Page: 2763 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 629 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Filed |