House | 05/12/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3256 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 679 | Journal Page: 3256 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Filed |