1 | | - | By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 1937 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
4 | | - | Affairs; May 8, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1937 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to procedures and eligibility for terminating |
---|
12 | 6 | | participation in the Teacher Retirement System of Texas deferred |
---|
13 | 7 | | retirement option plan. |
---|
14 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 824.805, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
16 | 10 | | amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read |
---|
17 | 11 | | as follows: |
---|
18 | 12 | | (b) This subsection applies only to a member participating |
---|
19 | 13 | | in the plan on September 1, 2005, or to a member whose period of |
---|
20 | 14 | | participation in the plan expired on or before September 1, 2005, |
---|
21 | 15 | | but who has not retired on or before that date. A member described |
---|
22 | 16 | | by this subsection may, before December 31, 2005, revoke the |
---|
23 | 17 | | member's decision to participate in the plan on a form prescribed by |
---|
24 | 18 | | and filed with the retirement system. The retirement system shall |
---|
25 | 19 | | make account transfers and change records for a member who revokes |
---|
26 | 20 | | the member's decision to participate in the plan under this |
---|
27 | 21 | | subsection as if the member had never participated in the plan. |
---|
28 | 22 | | (c) A member or beneficiary described by Subsection (d) may, |
---|
29 | 23 | | on or before December 31, 2015, revoke the member's decision to |
---|
30 | 24 | | participate in the plan on a form prescribed by and received by the |
---|
31 | 25 | | retirement system not later than that date. The retirement system |
---|
32 | 26 | | shall make account transfers and change records for a member whose |
---|
33 | 27 | | decision to participate in the plan is revoked under this |
---|
34 | 28 | | subsection, as if the member had never participated in the plan. |
---|
35 | 29 | | (d) Subsection (c) applies only to: |
---|
36 | 30 | | (1) a member: |
---|
37 | 31 | | (A) whose approved period of participation in the |
---|
38 | 32 | | plan has expired; and |
---|
39 | 33 | | (B) who has not retired on or before December 31, |
---|
40 | 34 | | 2015; or |
---|
41 | 35 | | (2) a beneficiary of a member whose approved period of |
---|
42 | 36 | | participation in the plan has expired and who has not retired before |
---|
43 | 37 | | death if: |
---|
44 | 38 | | (A) the beneficiary is eligible to receive both a |
---|
45 | 39 | | distribution of benefits payable on the death of the member and the |
---|
46 | 40 | | distributions from the plan; and |
---|
47 | 41 | | (B) the member dies on or after September 1, |
---|
48 | 42 | | 2015. |
---|
49 | 43 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
50 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 46 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1937 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 47 | + | 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 48 | + | voting. |
---|
| 49 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 51 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1937 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 52 | + | 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 53 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 54 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 55 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 56 | + | Date |
---|
| 57 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 58 | + | Governor |
---|